Race Thorson Mathews
Party represented
Australian Labor Party
Electorate
Oakleigh (5 May 1979 - 2 October 1992) Defeated
*The start date for Members elected after 1900 is the date they were elected. The start date for pre-1900 Members is the date they were sworn in.
Ministries
Minister for Community Services (14 December 1987 - 13 October 1988)
Minister for Police and Emergency Services (8 April 1982 - 14 December 1987)
Minister for the Arts (8 April 1982 - 14 December 1987)
Committee Membership
Member Legislative Assembly Privileges Committee (3 November 1988 - 14 August 1992)
Images of former members may be subject to copyright.
Research is ongoing to ensure the accuracy of former member information.
Committee memberships are being reviewed and updates will be published in due course.
Contact us if you have any questions or suggestions.
Contact heritage