Henry Isaac Cohen
Died: 20 December 1942 (Armadale, Victoria)
Parties represented
Nationalist
United Australia Party
Electorate
Melbourne. (1 May 1921 - 1 June 1937) By-election
*The start date for Members elected after 1900 is the date they were elected. The start date for pre-1900 Members is the date they were sworn in.
Ministries
Minister of Electrical Undertakings (20 March 1935 - 2 April 1935)
Minister of Water Supply (20 March 1935 - 2 April 1935)
Minister of Public Instruction (22 November 1928 - 12 December 1929)
Attorney-General (11 July 1924 - 18 July 1924)
Solicitor-General (11 July 1924 - 18 July 1924)
Commissioner of Public Works (19 March 1924 - 18 July 1924)
Minister of Mines (19 March 1924 - 18 July 1924)
Minister without portfolio (7 September 1923 - 19 March 1924)
Images of former members may be subject to copyright.
Research is ongoing to ensure the accuracy of former member information.
Committee memberships are being reviewed and updates will be published in due course.
Contact us if you have any questions or suggestions.
Contact heritage